21ST WHITLEY BAY ST PETERS SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1042806
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £9.12k £13.98k £9.70k £23.41k £11.78k
Total expenditure £9.37k £15.31k £10.74k £8.70k £9.54k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A £10.00k