Governing document BATHFORD LINK
Charity number: 1042822
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 SEPTEMBER 1994 AS AMENDED 30 NOVEMBER 1994 AND 2 NOVEMBER 2006 as amended on 13 May 2019 as amended on 09 May 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY OF BATHFORD AND IN PARTICULAR THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
BATHFORD AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.