Financial history YORK EBOR DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 1042881
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £28.62k £37.24k £20.79k £6.40k £11.97k
Total expenditure £35.47k £37.68k £18.49k £5.68k £7.06k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A