PLUMSTEAD COMMUNITY LAW CENTRE LTD.

Charity number: 1043070
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £197.80k £180.52k £159.89k £162.71k £162.65k
Total expenditure £257.91k £193.87k £153.64k £140.40k £163.96k
Income from government contracts £140.93k £140.44k £140.44k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £17.67k £0 N/A £140.44k £121.93k