Trustees HAMPSHIRE NORTH GUIDE ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1043313
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Elizabeth Blyth | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Brown | Trustee | 21 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Martin | Trustee | 21 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emily Wiggins | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Elizabeth Franks | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
LENA ANNE PONTING | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Barker | Trustee | 22 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clare Elizabeth May Blake | Trustee | 19 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Mary Warner | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|||||
Jane Day | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
SallyAnne Humphrys | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elizabeth Garvey | Trustee | 11 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Sally Jane Hill | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Ann Betteridge | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.