CHRISTIAN SCIENCE SOCIETY, CARDIFF

Charity number: 1043408
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £38.71k £12.15k £8.32k £8.33k £21.90k
Total expenditure £9.08k £7.83k £5.75k £5.78k £11.99k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A