Financial history COWES VOLUNTARY COMMUNITY GROUP

Charity number: 1043991
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £2.92k £3.58k £15.98k £38.78k £0
Total expenditure £3.04k £3.07k £5.71k £30.42k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £11.33k £16.57k N/A