Trustees THE MILLER CENTRE THEATRE COMPANY
Charity number: 1044236
Charity reporting is overdue by 32 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Rex Peter Millsted | Chair | 01 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Penelope Jane Parker | Trustee | 06 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Margaret Chilvers | Trustee | 06 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Keith Malcolm Orton | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Robin James Clark | Trustee | 06 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Martin Arthur Swain | Trustee | 06 October 2017 |
|
|||||
BERENICE HARCOURT BUTLER | Trustee | 09 September 2012 |
|
|||||
VERNON PETER CULVER | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.