TRUST PROPERTY IN CONNECTION WITH THE CHURCH AND TOWN LANDS, ALDERTON, NORTHAMPTONSHIRE

Charity number: 1044362
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £636 £61.06k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £468 £60.16k £180 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A