Trustees FRIENDS OF BILTON SCHOOL
Charity number: 1044468
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carina McLean Smith | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Todd | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Behan | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
SARAH COATES | Trustee | 03 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
KRISTINA ROBINSON | Trustee | 10 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
LEANNE TESKEY KING | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
KIRSTY GOTTS | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
SUZANNE FLYNN | Trustee | 07 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
HANNAH PRICE | Trustee | 11 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE WOODWARD | Trustee | 18 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
WENDY GLEW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CLARE COLES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EMMA HALDENBY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.