MENORAH FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1044649
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £1.48m £983.30k £973.02k £1.21m £996.46k
Total expenditure £682.63k £848.61k £977.06k £981.22k £1.09m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £740.35k £0 £8.68k £168.22k £36.18k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £983.26k £964.31k £963.84k £960.14k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.48m £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £131 £37 £25 £122 £137
Income - Other £0 £0 £8.68k £247.84k £36.18k
Income - Legacies £0 £983.26k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £682.63k £809.11k £977.06k £892.16k £999.83k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £39.50k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £3.00k £0 £2.40k £7.20k £10.83k
Expenditure - Grants institution £679.63k £809.11k £974.66k £884.96k £989.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £89.06k £86.90k