Trustees CASTLE HOWARD ARBORETUM TRUST
Charity number: 1044931
Charity reporting is up to date (46 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GREVILLE THOMAS WORTHINGTON | Chair | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Ian Graham | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Julia Willison | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Christopher Bridge | Trustee | 19 May 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Helen Crews | Trustee | 19 May 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Victoria Howard | Trustee | 25 February 2016 |
|
|
||||||
MICHAEL STURGE | Trustee | 05 June 2014 |
|
|||||||
Dr ALAN SUGGETT | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Nicola Spence | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Richard Hallam Barley | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||
JANE BARBARA INGHAM | Trustee |
|
||||||||
THE HONOURABLE NICHOLAS PAUL GEOFFREY HOWARD | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.