Financial history THE GROSVENOR WOMEN'S CLUB (CHESHIRE)

Charity number: 1044944
Charity reporting is overdue by 175 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022
Total gross income £13.71k £12.74k £12.53k £3.15k £715
Total expenditure £10.00k £8.89k £10.31k £1.79k £1.67k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A