Trustees THE JAMES LANGLEY MEMORIAL TRUST
Charity number: 1045160
Charity reporting is overdue by 81 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY JAMES BRADBURY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Clive Jones | Trustee | 02 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Garner | Trustee | 15 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
LIZ LARNER | Trustee | 06 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANNA GEORGINA WILLIAMSON | Trustee | 06 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW D H BURN | Trustee | 07 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Helen Jephcott | Trustee | 16 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANNA DOWNES | Trustee | 16 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
ROWAN NICHOLAS LANGLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.