Accounts and annual returns ST. FAITH'S COMMUNITY AND YOUTH ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1045344
Charity reporting is overdue by 692 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 327 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 327 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 692 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 692 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 March 2021 146 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 March 2021 146 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 12 December 2019 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 12 December 2019 42 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 17 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 17 August 2018 On time Download Open in new window