ST. JOHN'S, SMITH SQUARE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1045390
Charity reporting is up to date (62 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £1.00m £912.04k £1.19m £853.20k £733.45k
Total expenditure £1.14m £1.17m £1.20m £1.01m £806.64k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £14.50k N/A £35.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £156.78k £130.00k £348.48k £110.24k £179.07k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £760.23k £712.86k £780.45k £691.94k £480.75k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £83.23k £69.18k £60.52k £51.03k £32.09k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £41.54k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.11m £1.13m £1.17m £985.33k £775.29k
Expenditure - Raising funds £25.85k £32.10k £30.57k £23.69k £31.35k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0