Trustees ST ANDREW'S PLAYGROUP (HALIFAX)
Charity number: 1045454
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jessica Lois Sugden-Garnett | Chair | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Xana-Jo Bardsley | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Carrington | Trustee | 03 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ann Booth | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Howard | Trustee | 17 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Zoe Sembi | Trustee | 25 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephaney Milligan | Trustee | 07 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca McDonnell | Trustee | 06 September 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.