Trustees THE SIR WINSTON CHURCHILL ARCHIVE TRUST
Charity number: 1045646
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lord Paul Boateng PC | Chair | 09 November 2020 |
|
|||||||||||
Dr Anthony Nigel Stanley Freeling | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
Dr Jessica Pearsall Hall | Trustee | 18 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
Tamsin Melanie James | Trustee | 20 February 2017 |
|
|||||||||||
Dr William Frame | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
Gill Margaret Webber | Trustee | 17 November 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
Professor Dame Athene Donald | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.