PADDLE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1045851
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £13.64k £7.58k £9.36k £11.20k £7.46k
Total expenditure £8.53k £17.29k £4.47k £10.57k £4.45k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A