Trustees CYFANNOL WOMEN'S AID
Charity number: 1045890
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ann Hodgson | Chair | 27 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Anne O'Donoghue | Trustee | 06 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vilija Uzkurnyte | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Emma Louise Brute | Trustee | 13 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Legge | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ceri Elvina Meloy | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kay Perrott | Trustee | 26 November 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.