Trustees FRIENDS OF ST. NICHOLAS CHURCH ASH
Charity number: 1045933
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Ronald Burnside | Chair | 16 July 2008 |
|
|||||
George Legate | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louise Cousins | Trustee | 28 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Doherty Ellis | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Christine Anne Goatham | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kimberley Amanda Lawson-Wright | Trustee | 16 July 2008 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Victor James Collingwood | Trustee | 12 July 2007 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER FRANCIS DENBY | Trustee | 12 July 2005 |
|
|
||||
HAZEL HOWARD | Trustee | 22 July 2004 |
|
|||||
DENIS ROY BLAXLAND | Trustee | 01 May 1995 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.