Financial history THE MARIAN ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1046055
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £7.10k £1.52k £710 £1.05k £2.22k
Total expenditure £6.43k £1.47k £672 £59 £1.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A