Trustees MAYFIELD SCHOOL LTD
Charity number: 1047503
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lady Davies of Stamford Chantal Carolyn Davies | Chair | 03 August 2012 |
|
|||||
Deirdre Elizabeth Rowe | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Luminata Adaku Henshaw | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Veronica Maria Cloke Browne | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Larsson | Trustee | 02 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Angela Drew | Trustee | 02 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Frances Wood BSc Hons | Trustee | 16 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Martin Charles Reid LLB | Trustee | 21 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Marion Diane McGovern | Trustee | 10 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rhona Jane Lewis PhD, MA | Trustee | 20 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Buxton | Trustee | 25 May 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.