THE FRIENDS OF ST. MICHAEL'S WOBURN SANDS

Charity number: 1047831
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £10.99k £5.90k £9.96k £10.01k £8.95k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £25.38k £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A