Trustees INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS AND ENGINEERING IN MEDICINE
Charity number: 1047999
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Mohammad Al-Amri | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ayyakkannu Manivannan | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anna Pauline Barnes-McKenzie | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jason Neville Wilde | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Celia Jolliffe | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Iain Michael Threlkeld | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Eric Stubbs | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robert Dexter Farley | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Claire Marie Hardiman | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|||||
CHELSEA JANE ROCHE | Trustee | 27 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Justin Paul Richards | Trustee | 18 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Graham Turner | Trustee | 12 September 2016 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.