Trustees ST THOMAS PASTORIAL TRUST
Charity number: 1048671
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev David O'Brien | Chair | 16 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jayne Anderson | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Rachel Wilkinson | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Smith | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Sylvia Matthews | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Christopher Brambles | Trustee | 04 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Denise Moorby | Trustee | 25 September 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.