Trustees 1ST SUTTON (CAMBRIDGESHIRE) SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1048727
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Green | Chair | 03 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Peter David Robert John Sharp | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Booth | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Louise Barrett | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Hannah Margaret Groom | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Toni Sharp | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Chapman | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Charles Docherty | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Collins | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Gerard Ryan | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew David Pounce | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Cox | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Chaplin | Trustee | 26 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alison Wells | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.