Trustees ICKNIELD (LUTON) DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 1049542
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REX JOHN HORTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Carol Smart | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Jake Summerfield | Trustee | 25 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Maguire | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ellen Lill | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Keelan Pannell | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|||||
John Worthington | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS Michael JARMAN | Trustee | 22 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALAN WOOD | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.