Governing document CHILTON SCHOOL PTA - OXFORDSHIRE
Charity number: 1049882
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 OCTOBER 1979 AND AMENDED 22 SEPTEMBER 1981, 22 APRIL 1983, 30 SEPTEMBER 1986, 27 SEPTEMBER 1988, 22 SEPTEMBER 1993, 27 SEPTEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.