Accounts and annual returns PORTSMOUTH VIETNAMESE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1049913
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 February 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 01 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 01 July 2019 151 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 01 February 2018 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required