Financial history SRPCC CAT WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1049984
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.29k £841 £844 £1.78k £2.36k
Total expenditure £2.85k £1.82k £1.78k £1.20k £2.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A