SALLY DUCHESS OF WESTMINSTER'S MAINTENANCE FUND

Charity number: 1049997
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £6.79k £7.14k £7.57k £7.99k £6.43k
Total expenditure £2.00k £1.00k £11.00k £1.00k £1.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A