SIVAYOGAM

Charity number: 1050398
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nagendram Seevaratnam Chair 01 November 2019 None on record
Sanmugarajah P Tanaraja Trustee 03 December 2011 None on record
Arunasalam Gananathan Trustee 21 January 2018 None on record
Jeyakanthan Saravanamuthu Trustee 01 October 2021 None on record
Nimalan Seevaratnam Trustee 01 July 2021 None on record