HUMANITY FIRST

Charity number: 1050934
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2014 Overdue Overdue by 2272 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Overdue Overdue by 2272 days
Annual return 31 December 2013 Overdue Overdue by 2637 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Overdue Overdue by 2637 days
Annual return 31 December 2012 23 September 2013 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 23 September 2013 On time
Annual return 31 December 2011 05 October 2012 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 05 October 2012 On time
Annual return 31 December 2010 12 October 2011 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 12 October 2011 On time