Governing document SUPPORTED ACTIVITIES PROGRAMME
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12/05/1994 AS AMENDED ON 06/06/1995 AS AMENDED ON 13/06/2002 AS AMENDED ON 03/09/2008 AS AMENDED ON 11/06/2013 AS AMENDED ON 14 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE, OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF, FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THOSE WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES AS AFORESAID BY REASON OF THEIR LEARNING DISABILITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE NORTH HERTFORDSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.