THE FRIENDS OF ST. MARY MAGDALENE

Charity number: 1050969
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £2.67k £2.42k £3.05k £7.17k £4.79k
Total expenditure £149 £554 £1.66k £3.99k £5.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A