Financial history THE FRIENDS OF DRAMA STUDIO LONDON

Charity number: 1051375
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.93k £26.03k £2.84k £3.43k £9.37k
Total expenditure £2.30k £26.02k £2.60k £3.92k £10.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A