Financial history CHRISTIAN LIFE FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 1051796
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £266.57k £300.09k £308.52k £340.81k £316.81k
Total expenditure £259.39k £248.18k £273.57k £279.04k £276.08k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A