LONDON COLNEY YOUTH PROJECT

Charity number: 1051818
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £6.27k £7.05k £6.06k £9.13k £1.61k
Total expenditure £5.96k £6.80k £5.59k £8.44k £6.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A