Financial history West London NHS Charitable Fund

Charity number: 1051836
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £26.65k £32.92k £47.00k £259.66k £21.38k
Total expenditure £25.13k £40.21k £17.61k £203.04k £22.17k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A