Trustees COUNCIL FOR THE REGISTRATION OF SCHOOLS TEACHING DYSLEXIC PUPILS
Charity number: 1052103
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOORE ARMSTRONG | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
Robert Jennings | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Chivonne Preston | Trustee | 09 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Lynn Greenwold | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Anna SMith | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Fintan O'Regan | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Nick Gregory | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Andy Cook | Trustee | 14 March 2018 |
|
|
||||||
AATIF HASSAN | Trustee | 15 June 2016 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.