THE SHAFTESBURY CHRISTIAN CENTRE DEPTFORD TRUST

Charity number: 1052105
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A