Financial history Grace Church Sheffield

Charity number: 1052591
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £180.66k £237.00k £237.65k £173.98k £206.97k
Total expenditure £202.32k £200.80k £200.85k £160.85k £169.35k
Income from government contracts £1.41k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A