ANGEL GREEN CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 1052622
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £12.76k £16.86k £14.72k £15.50k £15.60k
Total expenditure £18.87k £17.85k £17.21k £16.93k £16.03k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A