Accounts and annual returns AMBLECOTE CHRISTIAN CENTRE
Charity number: 1052758
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2010 | 25 January 2011 | On time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2009 | 24 August 2010 | 116 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2009 | 24 August 2010 | 116 days late | |
Annual return | 30 June 2008 | 22 September 2010 | 510 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2008 | 11 September 2009 | 134 days late | |
Annual return | 30 June 2007 | 16 October 2008 | 169 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2007 | 12 November 2008 | 196 days late | |
Annual return | 30 June 2006 | 13 June 2007 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2006 | 18 June 2007 | 49 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window