Financial history LIFE IN THE NATIONS

Charity number: 1052963
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £7.36k £13.46k £24.20k £15.55k £31.89k
Total expenditure £10.58k £8.83k £24.81k £18.89k £25.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A