Financial history MERCY SHIPS - U.K LTD

Charity number: 1053055
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £5.79m £6.89m £7.01m £8.76m £9.34m
Total expenditure £4.97m £6.42m £6.78m £8.41m £8.59m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £328.18k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £5.66m £6.71m £6.96m £8.74m £9.34m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £149.59k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £122.43k £0 £15.76k £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £11.65k £24.72k £41.91k £20.84k £6.98k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £1.51m £1.70m £1.52m £1.69m £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.39m £4.65m £5.09m £6.54m £6.66m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.58m £1.76m £1.69m £1.87m £1.93m
Expenditure - Governance £94.75k £15.14k £11.40k £22.27k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £3.95m £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0