THE E.J.G. CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1053556
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
28/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020
Total gross income £20.98k £12.50k £4.88k £19.19k £10.93k
Total expenditure £18.05k £23.76k £13.26k £9.18k £14.05k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A