Trustees CLIENTEARTH
Charity number: 1053988
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Howard John Covington | Chair | 19 August 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
Gonenc Gurkaynak | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Jonathan David Kaufelt | Trustee | 02 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Assaad Wajdi Razzouk | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Devika Mokhtarzadeh | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Hermann Friedrich Bruhn | Trustee | 28 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Sonia Medina Gomez | Trustee | 09 November 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Georg Stratenwerth | Trustee | 22 March 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
SIR MARTIN GREGORY SMITH | Trustee | 22 March 2016 |
|
|||||||||
Frances Beinecke | Trustee | 25 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
SARAH BUTLER-SLOSS | Trustee | 05 February 2015 |
|
|||||||||
Philippe Marie Joseph Maurice Joubert | Trustee | 12 August 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
BRIAN ENO | Trustee | 31 October 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
WINSOME MCINTOSH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.