13th Howdon Scouts

Charity number: 1054270
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £10.87k £17.97k £14.42k £19.56k £21.65k
Total expenditure £14.16k £19.31k £18.25k £23.63k £21.65k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A